ME LD270 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Kinship Families by Creating a Kinship Care Navigator Program
Title
An Act To Support Kinship Families by Creating a Kinship Care Navigator Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Picchiotti [R] | Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Rep. Garrel Craig [R] | Sen. Robert Foley [R] |
Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Scott Strom [R] |
Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-673), in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-673) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-673). |
2018-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |