ME LD267 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Increase Certain Chiropractic Reimbursement Rates under the MaineCare Program
Title
Resolve, To Increase Certain Chiropractic Reimbursement Rates under the MaineCare Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Martin [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] |
Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-21), in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-21) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-21). |
2017-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |