ME LD264 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore the Right To Possess Certain Knives That Are Used by Many Citizens as Tools
Title
An Act To Restore the Right To Possess Certain Knives That Are Used by Many Citizens as Tools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Enactment RC #15 (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 15 (Yeas 120 - Nays 24 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2015-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-03-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence. |
2015-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |