ME LD264 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Crossbow Hunting during Muzzle-loading Season
Title
An Act To Allow Crossbow Hunting during Muzzle-loading Season
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #117 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED and ASKED FOR A COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE.. |
2013-05-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-30 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-05-29 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-05-29 | Senate | (14 -Yeas, 21 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call Number 117 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senator DUTREMBLE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed |