ME LD263 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - LD 263 In Senate, June 10, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 IN FAVOR and 9 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - LD 263 In Senate, June 10, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 IN FAVOR and 9 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide a Minor with a Defense to Prosecution in a Situation That Involves Risk of Alcohol Overdose
Title
An Act To Provide a Minor with a Defense to Prosecution in a Situation That Involves Risk of Alcohol Overdose
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #175 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #182 (Y: 124 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #182 (Y: 124 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | LD 263 In Senate, June 10, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 IN FAVOR and 9 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 182V 124 having voted in the affirmative and 23 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) , in concurrence. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-142). |
2015-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-05-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-03-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-02-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-02-24 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence. |
2015-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |