ME LD262 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore to Jimmy J. Soucy the Right To Maintain Existing Structures on Property in Sinclair
Title
An Act To Restore to Jimmy J. Soucy the Right To Maintain Existing Structures on Property in Sinclair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #98 (Y: 43 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town the COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was REJECTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Committee of Conference Report was READ. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-22 | House | The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass Report and Passage to be Engrossed and ASKED FOR A COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-05-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 98 (Yeas 43 - Nays 93 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-20 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass Report FAILED. |
2013-05-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-20 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative DILL of Old Town to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report. |
2013-05-20 | House | Representative DILL of Old Town moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report. |
2013-05-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed |