ME LD262 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Eligibility of Certain Municipal Landfills To Participate in the State's Remediation and Closure Program
Title
An Act To Expand Eligibility of Certain Municipal Landfills To Participate in the State's Remediation and Closure Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-30) in concurrence | |
2011-03-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-30) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-30) | |
2011-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |