ME LD26 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Change a Fishing Season Opening Date Statewide
Title
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Change a Fishing Season Opening Date Statewide
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Shaw [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Rep. Sheryl Briggs [D] |
Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Enactment RC #16 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Roll Call Number 16 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-02-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-02-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |