ME LD257 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Microgrids That Are in the Public Interest
Title
An Act To Allow Microgrids That Are in the Public Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #646 (Y: 80 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #605 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #578 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #605 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #578 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 646V 80 having voted in the affirmative and 68 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-720) in concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-720) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 605 Yeas 15 - Nays 20 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Motion by Senator WOODSOME of York the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-720). |
2018-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-720) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 578 (Yeas 76 - Nays 65 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |