ME LD254 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Standards by Which Law Enforcement Officers May Stop an All-terrain Vehicle Operating on Private Property
Title
An Act To Amend the Standards by Which Law Enforcement Officers May Stop an All-terrain Vehicle Operating on Private Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-160) in concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) 19 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY Roll Call # 99 | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-160) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Taken from the table by the President ProTem Roll Call Ordered On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-160) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-23 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Roll Call Requested On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Tabled Later Today Assigned pending acceptance of majority ought to pass as amended report Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Tabled Later Today Assigned pending motion by Same Senator to accept Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report in concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-160). | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-160) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 62 (Yeas 90 - Nays 56 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative DAVIS of Sangerville TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Martin of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |