ME LD253 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Alien Big Game and Turkey Hunters and Nonresident Hunters
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Alien Big Game and Turkey Hunters and Nonresident Hunters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 200 (Yeas 136 - Nays 5 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) | |
2009-06-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-03 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-02 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-01 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-01 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) in concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-06-01 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-29 | (S) On motion by Senator BRYANT of Oxford Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-29 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-396) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-01-27 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Bryant of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |