ME LD250 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Streamline and Clarify Laws Pertaining to the Civil and Criminal Possession of Marijuana
Title
An Act To Streamline and Clarify Laws Pertaining to the Civil and Criminal Possession of Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-15 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-14 | (S) OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) Report Accepted in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) Report in concurrence | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Report READ (Remarks Made) | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) | |
2009-04-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-01-27 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |