ME LD25 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee Regarding Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations Reporting Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee Regarding Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations Reporting Requirements

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-03-12SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-2), in concurrence.
2019-03-12SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-07SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-2) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-07SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-03-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-2).
2019-03-05HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
2019-02-28HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-02SenateOn motion by Senator Luchini of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
2019-01-02SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-01-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
2019-01-02HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-01-02HouseRepresentative MASTRACCIO for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 997, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback