ME LD25 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the Legislative Council from the Capitol Area Development Approval Process
Title
An Act To Remove the Legislative Council from the Capitol Area Development Approval Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Accept Min Otp Rpt RC #43 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #14 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #14 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate ADHERED to Accept the Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 43 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 14 (Yeas 77 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2017-03-07 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-11 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |