ME LD25 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Regulate Domestic Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Regulate Domestic Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2015-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2015-06-18SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2015-06-18SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-469), in concurrence.
2015-06-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-469) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2015-06-18SenateREAD ONCE.
2015-06-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2015-06-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-18HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-469)
2015-06-18HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2015-06-18HouseUnder suspension of the rules
2015-06-18HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2015-01-14SenateOn motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
2015-01-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-01-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2015-01-13HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback