ME LD231 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow Municipalities To Regulate the Growing of Marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow Municipalities To Regulate the Growing of Marijuana

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02HouseCarried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-01-31HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION
2017-01-26SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-01-26SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION
2017-01-26SenateCommittee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback