ME LD23 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 3: Maine Clean Election Act and Related Provisions, a Major Substantive Rule of the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 3: Maine Clean Election Act and Related Provisions, a Major Substantive Rule of the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-03-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2019-02-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Luchini of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-01-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2019-01-02 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-02 | House | Representative SCHNECK for the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |