ME LD23 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide for Legislative Review of Federally Mandated Major Substantive Rules under the Maine Administrative Procedure Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide for Legislative Review of Federally Mandated Major Substantive Rules under the Maine Administrative Procedure Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #44 (Y: 77 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2017-04-25HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseROLL CALL NO. 44V 77 having voted in the affirmative and 67 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2017-04-25HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-04-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-04-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-04-04SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2017-04-04SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2017-04-04SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2017-03-30SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2017-03-30SenateREAD ONCE
2017-03-30SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-03-30SenateReports Read
2017-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-28HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2017-03-28HouseREAD the Second Time.
2017-03-28HouseCommittee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
2017-03-23HouseTOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
2017-03-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-03-23HouseOn motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-03-23HouseReports READ.
2017-01-11Senatein concurrence
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-01-11Senatesuggested and ordered printed
2017-01-11SenateCommittee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-01-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2017-01-10HouseCommittee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback