ME LD229 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Compensate Tribal Governments for Basic Training for a Law Enforcement Officer Hired by Another Government Agency
Title
An Act to Compensate Tribal Governments for Basic Training for a Law Enforcement Officer Hired by Another Government Agency
Sponsors
Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-242), in concurrence. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-242) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-242). |
2023-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |