ME LD227 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to the Establishment of Casinos
Title
An Act Relating to the Establishment of Casinos
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Bartlett [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. George Hogan [D] | Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] |
Sen. Edward Mazurek [D] | Rep. Donald Pilon [D] | Rep. Diane Russell [D] | Sen. Linda Valentino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-29 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 125th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1190, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2011-06-29 | (H) Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 125th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1190. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=227&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0153&item=1&snum=125 |