ME LD2260 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Update the Laws Regarding the Sale of Pari-mutuel Pools for Simulcast Races
Title
An Act to Update the Laws Regarding the Sale of Pari-mutuel Pools for Simulcast Races
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-27 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2024-03-12 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hickman of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec for the Joint Standing Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs pursuant to Public Law 2023, chapter 440, section 13. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2260&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0977&item=1&snum=131 |