ME LD225 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Transportation Management Software and School Bus Replacement
Title
An Act Regarding Transportation Management Software and School Bus Replacement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #30 (Y: 82 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 30 (Yeas 82 - Nays 59 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 2) |
2019-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |