ME LD225 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore Consumer Rate Review for Health Insurance Plans in the Individual Market
Title
An Act To Restore Consumer Rate Review for Health Insurance Plans in the Individual Market
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #427 (Y: 89 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #295 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #329 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #295 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #329 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 427V 89 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2013-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Number 295 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314). |
2013-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 329 (Yeas 85 - Nays 56 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-17 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-04 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Representative TREAT of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |