ME LD222 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Commercial Shellfish License Fees for Persons under 18 Years of Age
Title
An Act To Reduce Commercial Shellfish License Fees for Persons under 18 Years of Age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending , in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-33), in concurrence. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-33) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-33). |
2015-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Baker of Sagadahoc, REFERRED to the Committee on Marine Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-02-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |