ME LD2211 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Quality of Care and the Board of Trustees at the Maine Veterans' Homes
Title
An Act Regarding Quality of Care and the Board of Trustees at the Maine Veterans' Homes
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Marc Malon [D] |
Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Maureen Terry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-882) in concurrence |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-882) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-882). |
2024-04-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-882) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-01 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2024-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |