ME LD2209 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase the Cap on Bonds Issued by the Maine State Housing Authority to Reflect Current Housing Production Needs in the State
Title
An Act to Increase the Cap on Bonds Issued by the Maine State Housing Authority to Reflect Current Housing Production Needs in the State
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-788), in concurrence. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-788) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-788). |
2024-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING in concurrence |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-02-13 | Senate | On motion by @CommitteeChair REFERRED to the Committee on COMMITTEE, in concurrence. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING |
2024-02-13 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative GERE for the Joint Select Committee on Housing pursuant to Joint Order 2023, H.P. 3, section 3 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |