ME LD218 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Small-scale Poultry Farming
Title
An Act To Promote Small-scale Poultry Farming
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Rep. Ralph Chapman [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] |
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Brian Jones [D] | Rep. Aaron Libby [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - Adopt Hah-497 To Cah-476 RC #321 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto, in concurrence. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-497) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) READ. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee "A" (H-476) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto. |
2013-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 321 (Yeas 111 - Nays 34 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, House Amendment "A" (H-497) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) was READ. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2013-06-12 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle REMOVED. |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |