ME LD2143 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Exempt from Sales Tax the Sale and Delivery of All Residential Electricity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Exempt from Sales Tax the Sale and Delivery of All Residential Electricity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-04-02SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2024-04-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-04-01HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-866) in concurrence
2024-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-866) READ and ADOPTED
2024-03-28SenateREAD ONCE
2024-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-866) Report ACCEPTED
2024-03-28SenateReports READ
2024-03-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-27HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-866).
2024-03-27HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2024-03-27HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-866) was READ and ADOPTED.
2024-03-27HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2024-03-27HouseOn motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2024-03-27HouseReports READ.
2024-03-26JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
2024-02-20JointVoted: Divided Report
2024-02-20JointWork Session Held
2024-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2024-01-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-01-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2024-01-03HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback