ME LD214 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Regarding Zoning and Land Use Restrictions to Limit Certain Requirements to Municipalities with a Population of More than 10,000
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Regarding Zoning and Land Use Restrictions to Limit Certain Requirements to Municipalities with a Population of More than 10,000
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #240 (Y: 75 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator PIERCE of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 240 (Yeas 75 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-15 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Pierce of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on Housing, in concurrence. |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING. |
2023-02-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-02-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-01-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-01-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-01-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-01-24 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed. |