ME LD214 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 359 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase Funding for Civil Legal Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase Funding for Civil Legal Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Enactment RC #359 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 359 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-370) thereto.
2019-06-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-370) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-370) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-370) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) was ADOPTED
2019-06-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-316)
2019-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-19SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 359 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) in concurrence
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-316) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-28SenateReports Read
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-316).
2019-05-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-316) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-23HouseOn motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-23HouseReports READ.
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2019-01-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-01-22HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback