ME LD2139 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Add Schedule V Substances to the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Title
An Act to Add Schedule V Substances to the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2024-02-29 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-02-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-23 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |