ME LD209 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Rights of Grandparents under the Grandparents Visitation Act
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Rights of Grandparents under the Grandparents Visitation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #66 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 66 (Yeas 105 - Nays 40 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-01 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-01 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-04-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-04-25 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-04-25 | House | Representative PRIEST of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |