ME LD2078 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase Participation by the Department of Health and Human Services Regarding Federal Benefits for Which Children in the Custody of the Department May Be Eligible
Title
An Act to Increase Participation by the Department of Health and Human Services Regarding Federal Benefits for Which Children in the Custody of the Department May Be Eligible
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Roeder [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-893), in concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-893) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-893). |
2024-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2023-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2023. |