ME LD207 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Rename the Stillwater Bridges in Old Town the Llewellyn Estes Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Rename the Stillwater Bridges in Old Town the Llewellyn Estes Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] |
Rep. Arthur Verow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-03-12 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |