ME LD2026 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize Medical Waivers for Menhaden Fishing Licenses
Title
An Act to Authorize Medical Waivers for Menhaden Fishing Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-545). |
2024-02-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-02-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-545) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-545) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-02-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 11, 2023 and REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |