ME LD2021 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Funding for Broadband Internet Infrastructure in Unserved and Underserved Areas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Funding for Broadband Internet Infrastructure in Unserved and Underserved Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #424 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseLater today assigned.
2020-03-17HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2020-03-17HouseRepresentative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2020-03-17HouseReports READ.
2020-03-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2020-03-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-414)
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-414) READ and ADOPTED
2020-03-12SenateREAD ONCE
2020-03-12SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 424 Yeas 27 - Nays 1 - Excused 7 - Absent 0
2020-03-12SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2020-03-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2020-03-10SenateUnfinished Business
2020-03-05SenateUnfinished Business
2020-03-05SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2020-03-05SenateReports READ
2020-01-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-01-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2020-01-14SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback