ME LD202 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 22: Standards for Outdoor Application of Pesticides by Powered Equipment in Order To Minimize Off-target Deposition, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Board of Pesticides Control
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 22: Standards for Outdoor Application of Pesticides by Powered Equipment in Order To Minimize Off-target Deposition, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Board of Pesticides Control
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2015-01-29 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative HICKMAN for the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Board of Pesticides Control pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |