ME LD2018 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 812 Yeas 19 - Nays 11 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 812 Yeas 19 - Nays 11 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations Regarding the Incorporation of Equity Considerations in Regulatory Decision Making
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations Regarding the Incorporation of Equity Considerations in Regulatory Decision Making
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #812 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #805 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #805 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 812 Yeas 19 - Nays 11 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-642) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 805 Yeas 19 - Nays 10 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-642) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-642) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-642) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-999). |
2022-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-999) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brenner of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-03-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Representative TUCKER for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to Public Law 2021, chapter 279, section 3, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |