ME LD2015 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update the Comprehensive State Energy Plan To Achieve the State Energy Vision
Title
An Act To Update the Comprehensive State Energy Plan To Achieve the State Energy Vision
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #547 (Y: 72 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report B Ought Not To Pass In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-967). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report B Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-967). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-967) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 547 (Yeas 72 - Nays 53 - Absent 22 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lawrence of York REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-03-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Representative BERRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 2, section 9, subsection 3, paragraph C-1, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |