ME LD2012 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Authority of Municipalities To Regulate Timber Harvesting
Title
An Act Regarding the Authority of Municipalities To Regulate Timber Harvesting
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2022-03-29 | House | Report was READ. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2012&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0728&item=1&snum=130 |