ME LD201 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions and Promote Weatherization in the Buildings Sector by Extending the Sunset Date for the Historic Property Rehabilitation Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions and Promote Weatherization in the Buildings Sector by Extending the Sunset Date for the Historic Property Rehabilitation Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-56). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56). |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-56) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |