ME LD2009 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Permit the Expansion of Municipal Membership of the Greater Portland Transit District
Title
An Act To Permit the Expansion of Municipal Membership of the Greater Portland Transit District
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-01-30 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-01-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2020-01-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2020-01-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2020-01-14 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |