ME LD2002 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate Inactive Boards and Commissions
Title
An Act To Eliminate Inactive Boards and Commissions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-819), in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-819) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-819). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-21 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Baldacci of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-02-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | Representative MATLACK for the Joint Standing Committee on State and Local Government pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 12006, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |