ME LD200 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Wild Turkey Hunting Opportunities
Title
An Act To Expand Wild Turkey Hunting Opportunities
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Marks [D] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Rep. Dale Crafts [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] |
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Stanley Short [D] | Rep. Stephen Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-547) thereto, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-547) thereto ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-547) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-547) thereto. |
2013-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-547) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish House Amendment "A" (H-547) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-542) was READ. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative SHAW of Standish REMOVED. |
2013-06-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |