ME LD2 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Bad Faith Assertions of Patent Infringement
Title
An Act To Prevent Bad Faith Assertions of Patent Infringement
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] |
Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Report A Ought Not to Pass READ and ACCEPTED. In CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2017-01-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0004&item=1&snum=128 |