ME LD2 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Farm Wineries To Charge for Wine Tastings
Title
An Act To Allow Farm Wineries To Charge for Wine Tastings
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Sen. Michael Thibodeau [R] |
Sen. David Trahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) | |
2011-04-26 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-04-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 26 25 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-04-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2011-01-05 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS | |
2011-01-05 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |