ME LD1986 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to Net Energy Billing and Distributed Solar and Energy Storage Systems
Title
An Act Relating to Net Energy Billing and Distributed Solar and Energy Storage Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-06 - House - Recede And Concur RC #353 (Y: 77 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - Passage To Be Enacted RC #339 (Y: 63 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-06-26 - House - Reconsider RC #338 (Y: 73 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - Enactment RC #332 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2023-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #321 (Y: 69 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #444 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - Passage To Be Enacted RC #339 (Y: 63 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-06-26 - House - Reconsider RC #338 (Y: 73 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - Enactment RC #332 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2023-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #321 (Y: 69 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #444 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 353 (Yeas 77 - Nays 52 - Absent 22 - Excused 0) |
2023-07-06 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion Reconsideration of Passage to be Enacted. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending RECONSIDERATION of PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 339 (Yeas 63 - Nays 76 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2023-06-26 | House | Subsequently, FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 338 (Yeas 73 - Nays 65 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2023-06-26 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill FAILED of PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-26 | House | RELEASED. |
2023-06-26 | House | HELD. |
2023-06-26 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 332 (Yeas 62 - Nays 69 - Absent 20 - Excused 0) |
2023-06-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-421). |
2023-06-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 321 (Yeas 69 - Nays 65 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2023-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 444 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |