ME LD1982 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Public Safety To Conduct a Study To Develop Best Practices for Improving the Security of Municipal Properties
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Public Safety To Conduct a Study To Develop Best Practices for Improving the Security of Municipal Properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2020-01-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-21 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1982&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0684&item=1&snum=129 |