ME LD1972 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Public Records Exceptions Related to Research and Aquaculture Leases
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Public Records Exceptions Related to Research and Aquaculture Leases
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2022-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-23 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-02-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-02-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-10 | House | Representative HARNETT for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 411, subsection 6, paragraph G, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |