ME LD197 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Explicitly Protect against Sex Discrimination
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Explicitly Protect against Sex Discrimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Final Passage - Con Res RC #187 (Y: 77 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #134 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #89 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #134 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #89 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE 2/3 Vote Required |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 187 (Yeas 77 - Nays 62 - Absent 11 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken. |
2017-05-31 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-18 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 134 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-133). |
2017-05-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 89 (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-26 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |